SD SB138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the construction of a nursing home facility in Rosebud, South Dakota.
Title
Authorize the construction of a nursing home facility in Rosebud, South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538 |
2016-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2016 S.J. 484 |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 724 |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 463 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 666 |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 628 |
2016-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 381 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 285 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 245 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 138ya |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 193 |