SD SB138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Signed by Governor S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-26 - Signed by Governor S.J. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to title-based escheatment of abandoned United States savings bonds and the proceeds thereof.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to title-based escheatment of abandoned United States savings bonds and the proceeds thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Isaac Latterell [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 476 |
2014-02-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 396 |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 477 |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by President S.J. 373 |
2014-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 433 |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 411 |
2014-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 357 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 0. S.J. 260 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 236 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 183 |