SD SB138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation.
Title
Revise the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Tabled (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 621 | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 486 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 410 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 385 | |
2012-02-09 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 350 | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 134 |