SD SB137 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the application for absentee voting.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the application for absentee voting.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 549 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 501 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 359 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 300 | |
2012-02-06 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-06 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 274 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 134 |