SD SB136 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change the criteria for a petition to vacate a highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the criteria for a petition to vacate a highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSigned by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
2021-02-23SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 23, 2021 S.J. 328
2021-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 336
2021-02-18SenateSigned by the President S.J. 297
2021-02-17HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 305
2021-02-16HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-16HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-02-16HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 273
2021-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 226
2021-02-05SenateTransportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1.
2021-02-05SenateTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136C
2021-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 136

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback