SD SB136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the utilization of telehealth by a health care professional.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the utilization of telehealth by a health care professional.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 747
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 685
2019-03-11HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 1. S.J. 679
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 680
2019-03-05HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-03-05HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 626
2019-03-05HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136bc
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 329
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 285
2019-02-06SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 285 Amendment 136kb
2019-02-05SenateRemove from Consent Calendar S.J. 264
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-01-30SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 223
2019-01-30SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136ka
2019-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 189

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=136&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB136P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB136SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB136S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB136HHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB136ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27643&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27864&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29137&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29297&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29362&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback