SD SB134 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to physician assistants.
Title
Revise provisions related to physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 316 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 314 Amendment 134B |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 278 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 239 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 129 |