SD SB133 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allow public funds not needed for current operating expenses to be invested in certain certificates of deposit or time deposits.
Title
Allow public funds not needed for current operating expenses to be invested in certain certificates of deposit or time deposits.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Partridge [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 432 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 369 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133B |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 133A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Prime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor S.J. 305 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 116 |