SD SB132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation on education.
Title
Accommodate legislation on education.
Sponsors
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 502 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 472 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 440 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 188 |