SD SB132 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the development of a rural 211 system for the purpose of providing access to all South Dakotans who need information about community resources and disaster response resources and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Provide for the development of a rural 211 system for the purpose of providing access to all South Dakotans who need information about community resources and disaster response resources and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | Senate | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 401 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 170 |