SD SB131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a target teacher salary and a target teacher ratio, to revise certain provisions regarding education funding, to create the School Finance Accountability Board, and to provide for certain school district reporting and penalties.
Title
Establish a target teacher salary and a target teacher ratio, to revise certain provisions regarding education funding, to create the School Finance Accountability Board, and to provide for certain school district reporting and penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 39 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 610 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 871 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 602 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 590 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 12. H.J. 823 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 28. H.J. 821 Amendment 131rd |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 820 Amendment 131cm |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 820 Amendment 131cl |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 800 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 728 |
2016-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 131cj |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 665 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 419 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 418 Amendment 131fb |
2016-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 131ja |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 177 |