SD SB128 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning elections.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Intent to reconsider (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Intent to reconsider (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 16. H.J. 558 | |
2012-02-21 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 518 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 486 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 5. S.J. 429 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 429 Amendment 128fa | |
2012-02-14 | Intent to reconsider, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 8. S.J. 429 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 421 | |
2012-02-13 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | Re-referred to Senate Local Government, Passed S.J. 295 | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 133 |