SD SB127 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions regarding the Law Enforcement Officers Certification Commission.
Title
Revise provisions regarding the Law Enforcement Officers Certification Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 381 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 3. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 127wa |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 187 |