SD SB124 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide protections for the exercise of religious freedom.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide protections for the exercise of religious freedom.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 472
2021-03-09SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 460
2021-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 527
2021-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 422
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 472
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 304
2021-02-16SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 265
2021-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 251
2021-02-10SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 135

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback