SD SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 39. H.J. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 39. H.J. 648
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct a maintenance shop in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Bureau of Administration to construct a maintenance shop in Pierre, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Removed from table (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 39. H.J. 648 | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 124ota | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 592 | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 124oa | |
2011-03-02 | Appropriations Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. | |
2011-02-28 | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 543 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-23 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 493 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 489 | |
2011-02-16 | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 444 | |
2011-02-16 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 124mb | |
2011-02-16 | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 124ma | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 197 |