SD SB123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions pertaining to voter registration requirements and the state board of elections.
Title
Revise provisions pertaining to voter registration requirements and the state board of elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Liz Larson [D] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Will Mortenson [R] |
Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - Tabled (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 454 |
2024-02-28 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2024-02-28 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 123C |
2024-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-26 | House | State Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed |
2024-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-21 | House | State Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 216 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 203 |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-29 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 147 |