SD SB122 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 24. S.J. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restrict the enactment of policies governing the possession of firearms at public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrict the enactment of policies governing the possession of firearms at public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 24. S.J. 406
2019-02-14SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383
2019-02-12SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 363
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 186

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback