SD SB121 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize an alcoholic beverage retail license for certain malt beverage and wine dealers.
Title
Authorize an alcoholic beverage retail license for certain malt beverage and wine dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 645 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 652 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 616 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 607 | |
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 584 | |
2011-02-28 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 544 | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-25 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-14 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 372 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 403 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 379 | |
2011-02-03 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 325 | |
2011-02-03 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 121fa | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 196 |