SD SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modify the time period allowable for certain covenants not to compete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify the time period allowable for certain covenants not to compete.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 18. S.J. 459
2019-02-19SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 400
2019-02-14SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383
2019-02-12SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 342
2019-02-12SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 120wb
2019-02-12SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 120wa
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 186

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback