SD SB120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Rep. Larry Tidemann [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538 |
2016-03-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2016 S.J. 500 |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 744 |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 481 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 705 |
2016-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687 |
2016-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622 |
2016-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 427 |
2016-02-16 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 396 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 295 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 1. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 120na |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 166 |