SD SB120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding special alcoholic beverage licenses issued in conjunction with special events and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding special alcoholic beverage licenses issued in conjunction with special events and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 719 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by President S.J. 711 |
2015-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 725 |
2015-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 716 Amendment Cc120a |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 677 |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 663 Amendment Cc120a |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 675 |
2015-03-09 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 637 |
2015-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 620 |
2015-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 619 Amendment 120fb |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 600 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 597 Amendment 120xb |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 597 Amendment 120xa |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 596 Amendment 120rc |
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 553 |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 362 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 342 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed S.J. 298 Amendment 120fta |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 120fa |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 120ra |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 210 |