SD SB119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Permit the use of tribal identification cards when registering to vote.
Title
Permit the use of tribal identification cards when registering to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - House - Tabled (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 388 |
2024-02-21 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. |
2024-02-21 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 119C |
2024-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2024-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 261 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 3. S.J. 259 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 259 Amendment 119B |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 249 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-31 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 119A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 147 |