SD SB119 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-4)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide certain provisions regarding the furnishing of fraudulent disability documentation when renting accommodations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide certain provisions regarding the furnishing of fraudulent disability documentation when renting accommodations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
2018-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27HouseSigned by the President S.J. 623
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 604
2018-02-23HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 569
2018-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 315
2018-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 335
2018-01-30SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 264
2018-01-30SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 119ka
2018-01-30SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 199

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=119&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB119P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB119SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB119ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24988&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25195&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24988&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25195&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26292&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26412&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback