SD SB119 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding abandoned mobile and manufactured homes.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding abandoned mobile and manufactured homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 646 |
2015-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 628 |
2015-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 609 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-03-04 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 586 |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 540 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 514 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 470 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Taxation Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 119oa |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 210 |