SD SB118 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide additional transparency for prescription drug plans.
Title
Provide additional transparency for prescription drug plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2015-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 619 |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 574 |
2015-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557 |
2015-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 549 |
2015-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 529 |
2015-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503 |
2015-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 471 |
2015-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 458 |
2015-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2015-02-17 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 406 |
2015-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 362 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 342 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 300 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 118rb |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 209 |