SD SB117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 9. S.J. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 9. S.J. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the gross receipts tax on certain food.
Title
Revise the gross receipts tax on certain food.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Failed to concur, no committee appointed (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Removed from table (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Removed from table (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Failed to concur, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 9. S.J. 486 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 615 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 25. H.J. 613 Amendment 117C |
2022-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 117B |
2022-03-02 | House | State Affairs Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-28 | House | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 467 |
2022-02-08 | House | First Reading House H.J. 236 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 196 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 182 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 115 |