SD SB114 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize municipalities to include flexible spending accounts, flexible spending account debit cards, and related programs and procedures with employee health insurance benefits.
Title
Authorize municipalities to include flexible spending accounts, flexible spending account debit cards, and related programs and procedures with employee health insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Rep. Noel Hamiel [R] | Sen. Kathleen Miles [D] | Rep. Darrell Solberg [D] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 0. H.J. 732 | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-03-04 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 351 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 262 | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 250 | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-03 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 221 | |
2010-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-01 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 149 |