SD SB113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide that certain information contained within applications for money lending licenses are public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide that certain information contained within applications for money lending licenses are public records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 575
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2019-02-25HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 515
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 355
2019-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 319
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-07SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 300
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 185

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback