SD SB113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the fiscal impact statements prepared for legislation that impacts state prison or county jail populations.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the fiscal impact statements prepared for legislation that impacts state prison or county jail populations.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2015-03-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 619 |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 |
2015-03-04 | House | Signed by President S.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 569 |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-27 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 552 |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 305 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 288 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-30 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 243 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 191 |