SD SB112 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish requirements for filling the vacancies of certain constitutional offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish requirements for filling the vacancies of certain constitutional offices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 14. H.J. 487
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 456
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 213
2021-02-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 195
2021-02-02SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 159
2021-02-01SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 115

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback