SD SB112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions requiring the attorney general to obtain the consent of the Governor prior to commencing an investigation.
Title
Repeal certain provisions requiring the attorney general to obtain the consent of the Governor prior to commencing an investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 595 |
2018-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 390 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 404 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 382 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 198 |