SD SB112 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning tax increment districts.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning tax increment districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Rep. Michele Harrison [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 831 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805 |
2016-03-03 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 774 |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 665 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 411 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 414 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 413 Amendment 112fb |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 357 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 112fa |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 164 |