SD SB111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions on aiding, abetting, or advising.
Title
Revise provisions on aiding, abetting, or advising.
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Symens [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Rep. Jess Olson [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] |
Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] | Sen. Erin Tobin [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 116 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 104 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/23140 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/229600.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/73086 |