SD SB111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-9)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-9)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend for two years the period of time in which school districts may expend capital outlay funds for certain transportation, insurance, energy, and utility costs.
Title
Extend for two years the period of time in which school districts may expend capital outlay funds for certain transportation, insurance, energy, and utility costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 696 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 8. H.J. 579 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 562 | |
2011-02-25 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. H.J. 528 | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 248 | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 253 | |
2011-01-27 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 220 | |
2011-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 179 |