SD SB110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer funds to the South Dakota postsecondary scholarship grant fund for the South Dakota need-based grant program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Transfer funds to the South Dakota postsecondary scholarship grant fund for the South Dakota need-based grant program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Jennifer Healy Keintz [D] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Referred as Amended to (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 199 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Education Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 110A |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 103 |