SD SB110 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2018 S.J. 747
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain findings pertaining to pre-abortion counseling practices by abortion providers in South Dakota and to amend provisions regarding mandatory third-party pre-abortion counseling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain findings pertaining to pre-abortion counseling practices by abortion providers in South Dakota and to amend provisions regarding mandatory third-party pre-abortion counseling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2018 S.J. 747
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
2018-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27HouseSigned by the President S.J. 623
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 9. H.J. 611
2018-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 592
2018-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 565
2018-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539
2018-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 501
2018-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 480
2018-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 462
2018-02-13HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 416
2018-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 371
2018-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 390
2018-02-02SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 343
2018-02-02SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 110ja
2018-02-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 176

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback