SD SB110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding motor vehicle fuel not specifically taxed under the fuel excise tax.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding motor vehicle fuel not specifically taxed under the fuel excise tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. David Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] |
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] | Rep. James Schaefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Removed from table (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Removed from table (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 415 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 372 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 110fb |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Transportation Removed from table, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 243 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 163 |