SD SB110 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the release of certain military records of deceased veterans.
Title
Provide for the release of certain military records of deceased veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 497 |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 217 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 226 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 196 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 146 |