SD SB11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - No motion to reconsider S.J. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-27 - No motion to reconsider S.J. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Restore the chief agent of the Division of Criminal Investigation to a former position under certain circumstances.
Title
Restore the chief agent of the Division of Criminal Investigation to a former position under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | Senate | No motion to reconsider S.J. 183 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 175 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 20. S.J. 175 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 11fta |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 84 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 11fa |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17 |