SD SB11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Governor's Office of Economic Development to create and administer a working capital loan program.
Title
Authorize the Governor's Office of Economic Development to create and administer a working capital loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 510 | |
2012-02-15 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 480 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-07 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 337 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 282 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 260 | |
2012-01-31 | Commerce and Energy Title amended, Passed Amendment 11jta | |
2012-01-31 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 224 | |
2012-01-31 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. Amendment 11ra | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Senate Commerce and Energy, Passed S.J. 95 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 83 | |
2012-01-12 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 50 | |
2012-01-12 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 11oa | |
2012-01-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 15 |