SD SB109 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 695
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the Human Relations Act to allow certain discriminatory practices to be investigated by municipalities and counties.
Title
Revise the Human Relations Act to allow certain discriminatory practices to be investigated by municipalities and counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Reconsidered (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 695 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Local Government Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 275 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 146 |