SD SB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise a provision related to retrocession of jurisdiction over federal enclaves.
Title
Revise a provision related to retrocession of jurisdiction over federal enclaves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 370 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 15, 2024 S.J. 341 |
2024-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 337 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 315 |
2024-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 305 |
2024-02-08 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-08 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 238 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 240 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 221 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-22 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 128 |