SD SB108 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit dental insurers from setting fees for noncovered services.
Title
Prohibit dental insurers from setting fees for noncovered services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 748 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 673 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 448 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 338 | |
2010-02-11 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 290 | |
2010-02-11 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 108ja | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 148 |