SD SB106 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain provisions regarding the placement of a foster child with a relative or close family friend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain provisions regarding the placement of a foster child with a relative or close family friend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
2018-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27HouseSigned by the President S.J. 623
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 602
2018-02-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 569
2018-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-05HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 333
2018-02-02SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 354
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-01-31SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 284
2018-01-31SenateHealth and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 106ka
2018-01-31SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 175

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=106&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB106P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB106SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB106ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25078&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25078&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25286&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26308&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26410&Session=2018

Bill Comments 750

feedback