SD SB106 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 41. H.J. 691
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Assist in balancing the state's budget and fund rural housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assist in balancing the state's budget and fund rural housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed (Y: 26 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - House - State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass, Passed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - State Affairs Do Pass, Passed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 26, NAYS 41. H.J. 691
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2017-03-06HouseState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 106fb
2017-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 343
2017-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 331
2017-02-03SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2017-02-03SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 289
2017-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 202

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback