SD SB106 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the collection of sales taxes from certain remote sellers, to establish certain Legislative findings, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the collection of sales taxes from certain remote sellers, to establish certain Legislative findings, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 22, 2016 S.J. 619
2016-03-08HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560
2016-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 807
2016-03-03HouseSigned by the President S.J. 534
2016-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 740
2016-02-29HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 710
2016-02-29HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-02-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 621
2016-02-19SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 370
2016-02-17SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 316
2016-02-17SenateState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 106fc
2016-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-03SenateDeferred by Chair
2016-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 150

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback