SD SB106 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for risk management services for properties used to provide postsecondary technical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for risk management services for properties used to provide postsecondary technical education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 760
2015-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 746 Amendment cc106a
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 703
2015-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 695 Amendment Cc106a
2015-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 728
2015-03-11HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 669
2015-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 687
2015-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 687 Amendment 106sb
2015-03-09HouseAppropriations Title amended, Passed H.J. 653 Amendment 106cta
2015-03-09HouseAppropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1.
2015-03-09HouseAppropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106ca
2015-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-03-04HouseDeferred by Chair
2015-03-04HouseAppropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 106mta
2015-03-04HouseAppropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106mc
2015-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 540
2015-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 510
2015-02-20SenateAppropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 464 Amendment 106gta
2015-02-20SenateAppropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2015-02-20SenateAppropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106gb
2015-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=106&Session=2015
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB106P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB106SAP.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB106HAP.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2015/Bills/SB106H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=18861&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19063&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19583&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19671&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19831&Session=2015
Roll Callhttp://legis.sd.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=19863&Session=2015

Bill Comments 750

feedback