SD SB106 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 701
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Identify criteria to deny a minor boundary change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identify criteria to deny a minor boundary change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-11HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 701
2014-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 688
2014-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671
2014-03-05HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 644
2014-03-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 533
2014-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 433
2014-02-10SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 270
2014-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 222
2014-02-04SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 193
2014-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 132

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback