SD SB106 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for reciprocal nonresident trapping licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for reciprocal nonresident trapping licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-08 Signed by Governor S.J. 644
2011-03-01 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568
2011-02-28 Signed by Speaker H.J. 563
2011-02-25 Signed by President S.J. 542
2011-02-24 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 525
2011-02-23 House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504
2011-02-22 Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459
2011-02-22 Scheduled for hearing
2011-02-03 First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 280
2011-02-02 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 298
2011-02-01 Placed on consent, Passed
2011-02-01 Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 276
2011-02-01 Scheduled for hearing
2011-01-24 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 178

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback