SD SB106 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-13-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the Board of Regents and the Building Authority to contract for construction of classroom facilities at the University Center in Sioux Falls to replace facilities leased from the Sioux Falls School District, and to make an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the Board of Regents and the Building Authority to contract for construction of classroom facilities at the University Center in Sioux Falls to replace facilities leased from the Sioux Falls School District, and to make an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 63 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-29 Signed by Governor S.J. 684
2010-03-12 Signed by Speaker H.J. 856
2010-03-12 Signed by President S.J. 677
2010-03-12 Delivered to the Governor S.J. 677
2010-03-11 House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 844
2010-03-11 Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 659
2010-03-11 House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 832 Amendment Cc106A
2010-03-11 Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 655 Amendment cc106A
2010-03-10 House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 817
2010-03-10 Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 635
2010-03-09 House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 793 Amendment 106fta
2010-03-09 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 792
2010-03-09 House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 792 Amendment 106fb
2010-03-08 Scheduled for hearing
2010-03-04 Scheduled for hearing
2010-03-03 Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 744
2010-03-03 Deferred by Chair
2010-03-03 Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106ba
2010-03-03 Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106ua
2010-03-03 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-23 First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 568
2010-02-22 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 4. S.J. 419
2010-02-19 Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 383
2010-02-19 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-17 Deferred by Chair
2010-02-17 Scheduled for hearing
2010-02-03 Referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 221
2010-02-03 Scheduled for hearing
2010-01-27 First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 147

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bill.aspx?Bill=106
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bills/SB106P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bills/SB106HAP.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bills/SB106H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bills/SB106CNF.pdf
Texthttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/Bills/SB106ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=618
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=1373
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=1522
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=2153
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=2230
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=2315
Roll Callhttp://legis.state.sd.us/sessions/2010/RollCall.aspx?Vote=2327

Bill Comments

feedback